DE SB204 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill removes the time limitation applicable to exemptions for real property and manufactured homes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exemptions For Real Property In Federal Bankruptcy And State Insolvency Proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BANKING) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Banking Committee in Senate |