DE SB199 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act further clarifies the application of the provisions of this chapter.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Large Health Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-03-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 Favorable | |
2024-01-24 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2024-01-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |