DE SB194 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act removes the requirement that applicants for a marriage license state their race as part of the application process. Delaware is one of a small number of states that currently requires this information. In October 2019, the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia ruled that requiring marriage license applicants to provide their race violates the United States Constitution. In Delaware, the Clerks of the Peace, who are the points of data collection, have expressed support for this Act, as has the Office of Vital Statistics in the Department of Health and Social Services. The National Center for Health Statistics ("NCHS") has not requested detailed information from states regarding marriage and divorce since 1996. NCHS only requires states to provide the total number of marriages that occur each month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Marriage License Application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-26 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2020-01-17 Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
2020-01-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2019-12-19 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback