DE SB183 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill implements certain recommendations of the Lottery & Gaming Study Commission adopted on January 22, 2015 but not implemented by legislation in 2015. The Bill intends for the State to continue to benefit from video lottery proceeds, allows for continued employment at the State’s three video lottery facilities, and allows for the reinvestment of capital in those facilities to enable them to compete and remain vibrant tourism enterprises for the State. The Bill also provides for an expansion of the Internet lottery to include sports betting and allows video lottery agents to participate in all proceeds from the Internet lottery once administrative and vendor costs are paid. Effective July 1, 2016, the table game license fee is eliminated; and effective January 1, 2017 and January 1, 2018, the State’s share of gross table game revenues is revised to 20% and 15%, respectively. Video lottery agents shall receive certain credits for marketing expenditures and capital expenditures to be phased in over the next four fiscal years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lotteries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback