DE SB182 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill continues the practice of amending periodically the Delaware Revised Uniform Limited Partnership Act (the "Act") to keep it current and to maintain its national preeminence. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 17, Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Limited Partnerships And The Registration And Regulation Of Foreign Limited Partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-06 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |