DE SB178 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes the following changes to the Charter of the City of New Castle:
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of New Castle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-07 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2018-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |
2018-06-06 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 178 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |