DE SB172 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act reduces the at-large membership of the Milford School Board from 4 to 3 as of June 30, 2016. The current at-large member holding that seat will continue to do so until the end of his term on June 30, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Milford School Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-03SenateSigned by Governor
2016-01-28HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-01-27HouseReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2016-01-26HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
2016-01-21SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-01-21SenateReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-01-12SenateAssigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback