DE SB169 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act adopts the Uniform Civil Remedies for Unauthorized Disclosure of Intimate Images Act. This Act addresses an increasingly common form of abuse that can cause severe and often irreversible harm: the disclosure of private, sexually explicit images without consent. Much of the abuse is carried out electronically through internet websites, social media, email, or text messages, making it an interstate problem that is particularly suited for treatment by uniform state laws. This Act provides a uniform, comprehensive, clear, fair, and constitutionally sound definition of this harmful conduct and remedies for the harm it causes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Uniform Civil Remedies For Unauthorized Disclosure Of Intimate Images Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-29 Suspension of Rules in House
2020-01-30 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2020-01-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-29 Amendment SA 1 to SB 169 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-14 Amendment SA 1 to SB 169 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-19 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback