DE SB169 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation authorizes and requires the Justice of the Peace Court to conduct drug testing of its uniformed services employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drug Testing Of Uniformed Services Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2014-06-26HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-07HouseReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2014-04-08HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2014-04-03SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-03-27SenateReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2014-01-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback