DE SB157 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expedited partner therapy (EPT) is the clinical practice of treating the sex partners of patients diagnosed with a sexually transmitted disease without clinical assessment of the partners. In August 2006, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) recommended EPT as an evidence-based option to manage chlamydial infection and gonorrhea by treating index patients sex partners to prevent reinfection and curtail further transmission. As of July 2017, EPT is permissible in 41 states.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expedited Partner Therapy.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-01 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-04-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |