DE SB152 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
Pending: House Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
Pending: House Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act places a duty on the drivers of motor vehicles to clean ice and snow off of their vehicles prior to driving on the State’s highways. Greater penalties are provided for ice or snow dislodging from a moving vehicle and causing physical injury or property damage.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Ice And Snow On Certain Exposed Surfaces Of A Moving Vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Lavelle [R] | Sen. David Lawson [R] | Sen. Bryant Richardson [R] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |