DE SB150 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill empowers the State Election Commissioner to use information from the Division of Motor Vehicles for the improvement of voter registration records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Disclosure Of Motor Vehicle Records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-13 Signed by Governor
2011-07-01 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-07-01 Necessary rules are suspended in House
2011-06-30 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2011-06-29 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2011-06-23 Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback