DE SB15 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

As of July 1, 2012, this Act requires the State and its political subdivisions to verify employment authorization status for all new hires; requires public employers to only contract for physical performance of services within this State with contractors and subcontractors who verify employment authorization status; and requires, except for enumerated exceptions, that all state agencies and political subdivisions verify the lawful presence of those 14 years of age and older who apply for public benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certain Employment And Public Benefits Eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2011-06-14 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 3 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-06-14 Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-06-14 Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
2011-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2011-06-07 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2011-05-12 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2011-01-25 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback