DE SB148 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 15 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act expands the Division of Civil Rights and Public Trusts responsibility to review deadly use of force incidents by law enforcement by adding review of cases involving serious physical injury. It also requires that if the Division issues a public report on the use of force, the report must include the race of the law enforcement officer who used force, the race of the individual on whom force was used, and whether race was a relevant or motivating factor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Civil Rights And Public Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 15 NO
2021-06-17 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2021-06-11 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2021-06-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
2021-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable
2021-05-25 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback