DE SB147 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act codifies a reasonableness requirement for the use of force, both non-lethal and lethal. This is important when the state of mind is an issue in a criminal trial, such as when the judge or jury must decide as to what someone believed, knew, or intended at a given time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Use Of Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 NO
2021-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to SB 147 - Defeated By House. Votes: 3 YES 38 NO
2021-06-29 Amendment HA 4 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-28 Amendment HA 3 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-25 Amendment HA 2 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-17 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2021-06-11 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2021-06-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
2021-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable
2021-05-25 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback