DE SB137 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the crimes of unlawful possession of a drug masking product, punishable as a class A misdemeanor, and unlawful distribution, delivery, or sale of a drug masking product, punishable as a class E felony. Drug masking products are designed to be added to human urine or human hair to defraud alcohol or drug urine screening tests.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Unlawful Possession, Distribution, Delivery, Or Sale Of Drug Masking Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 137 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |