DE SB133 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Stricken in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Stricken in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act acknowledges that the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control has been collecting natural resource data for years without the consent of the respective property owners. This Act further prohibits the dissemination of natural resource data to any person or entity without first disclosing the date and method of collection along with obtaining the written consent of the respective property owner. In the event written consent cannot be obtained during a two year period following the effective date of this Act, the Department must expunge, without the distribution or transmission to any other person or entity any natural resource data.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code To Impose A Moratorium On The Publication Of Private Property Information By The Department Of Natural Resources And Environmental Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Stricken in Senate | |
2018-05-01 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-07-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate |