DE SB13 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Banking, Business & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act continues the reforms enacted over the past 4 years by restructuring Chapter 11 of Title 12, and adopting in substance many provisions from the 2016 Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act promulgated by the Uniform Law Commission. In addition, this Act adopts certain recommendations from the Delaware Unclaimed Property Task Force formed under Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 59 of the 147th General Assembly, and makes significant changes to the States unclaimed property law to bring greater predictability, efficiency, and fairness to the State's unclaimed property reporting process and compliance initiatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 12 And 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Abandoned Or Unclaimed Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-12 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-01-19 Amendment SA 1 to SB 13 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-19 Amendment SA 1 to SB 13 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-01-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-01-24 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-01-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-02-02 Signed by Governor

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback