DE SB13 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill confirms and establishes the authority of the Board of Parole to exercise discretion in reviewing the Risk Assessment Tier designation of an offender who was convicted of a registering offense prior to the enactment of Megan’s Law. This bill is a substitute because the original bill did not print with the necessary underlines.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Sexual Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 8 Favorable |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 13 |