DE SB13 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In January 2011, the Office of the Long Term Care Ombudsman transferred from the Division of Services for Aging and Adults with Physical Disabilities (DSAAPD) to the Delaware Health and Social Services Office of the Secretary. These amendments reflect the change by substituting the Department of Health and Social Services for DSAAPD where it is incorrect and removes the reference to the Public Guardian in the Advance Health Care Directive statute because that office does not have patient advocates or ombudsmen.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Care Decisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table in Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 13 |