DE SB121 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds the term “sexual orientation” to the already-existing list of prohibited practices of discrimination. As such, this Act would forbid discrimination against a person on the basis of sexual orientation in housing, employment, public works contracting, public accommodations, and insurance. In addition, this Act would establish that the Superior Court, in the first instance, would hear and adjudicate alleged criminal violations under the Act of equal accommodations, fair housing and employment discrimination.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6, 9, 18, 19, 25, And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Discrimination In Employment, Public Works Contracting, Housing, Equal Accommodations And The Insurance Business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-02 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 14 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 4 - Ruled Out of Order in House | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 4 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 3 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 15 YES 23 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 3 defeated | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 16 YES 21 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 defeated | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 13 YES 26 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 3 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 3 defeated | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 2 defeated | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 defeated | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |
2009-06-04 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |