DE SB114 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sections 1, 2, and 4 through 9 add chaperone requirements for the designated healthcare professionals of podiatry, chiropractic, dentistry and dental hygiene, nursing, occupational therapy, physical therapy/athletic training, social work and massage and bodywork, who treat minors consistent with the provisions added to the Medical Practice Act with practice specific modifications where appropriate. Section 3 of the bill enables licensure by reciprocity for chiropractors who were licensed prior to an examination requirement upon demonstrating active practice for 5 years in another jurisdiction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating Professions And Occupations Establishing Chaperone Requirements For The Treatment And Examination Of Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |