DE SB113 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act results from the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's review of the Hazardous Substance Cleanup Act Fund (HSCA Fund). Section 1 of the Act, which will take effect on January 1, 2021, provides that the Fund's 15% cap on administrative costs expenditures must be based on the average of the moneys deposited into the Fund over a period of the previous 10 fiscal years.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Hazardous Substance Cleanup Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |