DE SB113 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill confirms and establishes the authority of the Board of Parole to exercise discretion in reviewing the Risk Assessment Tier designation of an offender who was convicted of a registering offense prior to the enactment of Megan’s Law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Sexual Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2013-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |