DE SB113 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill creates a procedure by which youth exiting foster care in Delaware and who are provided services under the John H. Chafee Independence Act and/or the Fostering Connections and Increasing Adoptions Act of 2008 have a legal mechanism for Family Court to review the appropriateness of such services. The bill also specifically limits any findings on the reasonableness of the services to be offered and coordinated by the DSCYF to the youth, including financial, housing, medical, employment, training, education and other appropriate services, to the appropriations made to or by the State of Delaware for this purpose. Finally, the bill allows ongoing representation of the youth by the Office of the Child Advocate or the Court-Appointed Special Advocate program.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10, 29 And 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Extending The Jurisdiction Of The Family Court For Abused, Dependent And Neglected Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2010-05-11 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-04 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |