DE SB112 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
Pending: House Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
Pending: House Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee approved a project to work with the Governor's Office throughout 2018 and 2019 to identify antiquated boards, commissions, and councils that need statutory updates or outright repeals. The Council on Development Finance was identified as needing to simplify the party balance requirement to make it easier to fill vacancies and update language regarding appointments and quorum.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Council On Development Finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2020-01-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |