DE SB11 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act relates to police and fire pension funds created under Title 18 of the Delaware Code. The General Assembly created a special fund in the hopes of ensuring adequate pensions for affected police officers and firefighters, and their surviving spouses. This has not come to pass with regard to all pensions, however. By way of example only, the average surviving spouse in the Wilmington Police and Fire retirement plan receives a pension of only $10,080, which is $1,090 dollars below the 2012 poverty level. Moreover, there have been only five disbursements under the special fund in its 48 year history. To address this, the Act would allow for an additional manner of providing distributions from the related special fund established for Police and Fire pensions. Specifically, disbursements from the fund to be made under this Act would be biennial and structured in 3 categories. The 3 categories are based upon length of retirement and whether the eligible individual is a surviving spouse or receiving a disability pension.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 11 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 11 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-07 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |
2018-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |