DE HJR7 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing (1) that many of our educators are assuming greater levels of responsibility and demonstrating leadership in their classrooms and schools, (2) that our current educator compensation system does not reflect the work we value in our educators or provide them with a meaningful career pathway or ability to earn additional compensation for assuming additional responsibility, and (3) that we must retain and attract great educators to ensure that our students are prepared to compete in an increasingly global economy, this bill re-establishes the Committee to Advance Educator Compensation and Careers in addition to establishing two sub-committees: the Educator Work Group and the Technical Advisory Group. The Committee will continue its work in developing a plan for an alternative compensation structure and career pathway for educators aligned with the parameters set forth in Senate Bill No. 254, including providing educators with a meaningful career pathway, including higher starting salaries and recognition for working with high-needs students, and significant leadership opportunities for career advancement that keeps talented educators in the classroom. The Committee must submit updated recommendations to the Governor by March 31st, 2016 with sufficient detail for implementing legislation, and will continue to meet thereafter to issue subsequent recommendations for consideration.
Title
Re-establishing The Committee To Advance Educator Compensation And Careers To Develop An Alternative Compensation Structure And Career Pathway For Educators In Delaware.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Harvey Kenton [R] |
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2015-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |