DE HJR5 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution directs the Delaware Emergency Medical Services Oversight Council and the Office of Emergency Medical Services to establish statewide metrics for emergency room wait times, with such information being publicly reported on a regular basis and available to emergency responders.
Title
Relating To Improving Medical Outcomes By Establishing Statewide Metrics For Emergency Room Wait Times.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 NO | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HJR 5 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HJR 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |