DE HCR60 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This concurrent resolution rescinds all previous requests by the Delaware General Assembly for a federal constitutional convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescinding All Previous Requests By The General Assembly Of The State Of Delaware For A Federal Constitutional Convention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-03SenateIntroduced in Senate
2016-04-19HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 11 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-04-13HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2016-04-06HouseIntroduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback