DE HB93 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act provides clearer language concerning security alarm business license and identification requirements for both businesses and individuals; gives vendors a clearer understanding of prohibited acts, discipline and penalties; and grants the Professional Licensing Section the ability to promulgate regulations, conduct inspections and additional powers needed to oversee this chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Security Alarm Businesses And Security Alarm Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2017-04-04 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-04-04 Amendment HA 1 to HB 93 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-04-04 Amendment HA 1 to HB 93 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback