DE HB92 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this amendment to the Charter for the City of Wilmington is to make the auditing requirements for the City Auditor of the City of Wilmington consistent with the auditing requirements for the auditors for both the State of Delaware and New Castle County and consistent with the industry standard.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Wilmington Relating To Auditing Standards For The City Of Wilmington Auditor.
Sponsors
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |