DE HB73 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a special license plate for the Safe Haven No Kill Animal Sanctuary.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Or Registration Plates.
Sponsors
Sen. George Bunting [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-04-14 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2011-04-12 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |