DE HB72 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
As promoted in the Delaware Division of Motor Vehicles Motorcycle Operator Manual, it is recommended to motorcycle operators that they temporarily flash brake lights when stopping in order to increase visibility to other motorists. There are aftermarket products available for motorcycles that will automatically flash the brake lights up to five times, however these products are currently prohibited in the Delaware Code under the prohibition on flashing lights. This amendment will allow motorcycles to be equipped with this safety equipment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vehicle Equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Stricken |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |