DE HB66 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation changes the requirement for the Department of Transportation to submit a Capital Transportation Program from annually to biennially.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Darius Brown [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Capital Improvement) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-12 | Assigned to Capital Improvement Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-02-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |