DE HB56 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill sets certain regulations for motor vehicle data-reporting devices to prohibit the use by insurance companies of such data for anything other than consideration for premium discounts, requires disclosure to the insured of others who may gain access to such data, and otherwise prohibits insurance companies from releasing such data to others.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Automobile Insurance, Vehicle Data-reporting Device, And Unauthorized Use, Release, Or Disclosure Of Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |