DE HB51 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Fund to Combat Violent Crimes was established by House Substitute No. 1 for House Bill No. 143 of the 146th General Assembly. The Fund is funded by an additional penalty of $15 levied upon individuals convicted of crimes. This bill ensures that civil violations or penalties under Title 7, Title 11, Title 16 or Title 21 are included as offenses in which the $15 penalty is assessed for the Fund to Combat Violent Crimes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Fines, Costs, Penalties And Forfeitures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |