DE HB50 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-14 - Placed on the House Ready List
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates the right for the parent or guardian of a child to opt out of the annual assessment, currently the Smarter Balanced Assessment System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education Assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-14HousePlaced on the House Ready List
2015-07-16HouseVetoed by Governor
2015-06-25SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 31 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 2 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 2 Restored
2015-06-23HouseRestored in House
2015-06-23HouseDefeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 18 YES 16 NO 4 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 2 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 18 YES 21 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 2 defeated
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 2 - Introduced in House
2015-06-17SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-17SenateAmendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 3 NO 5 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-17SenateAmendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
2015-06-17SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-17SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2015-06-11SenateReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2015-05-07SenateAssigned to Education Committee in Senate
2015-05-07HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-05-07HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2015-05-07HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2015-04-22HouseReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2015-03-12HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/2bede841c6272c888025698400433a04/a7345a5746e0c7ba85257dd3006c4de2?OpenDocument
Texthttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/vwLegislation/HB+50/$file/legis.html?open
Texthttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/EngrossmentsforLookup/HB+50/$file/Engross.html?open
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/7712cf7cc0e9227a852568470077336f/99a3c4528118848d85257e6700826f40?OpenDocument
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/7712cf7cc0e9227a852568470077336f/d923ee53d5a4445585257e6d007bcea2?OpenDocument
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/7712cf7cc0e9227a852568470077336f/5b3c175f19ddb3de85257e6d007fbe13?OpenDocument
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/7712cf7cc0e9227a852568470077336f/544ceecae8afed1785257e6f00690c78?OpenDocument
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/LIS/lis148.nsf/7712cf7cc0e9227a852568470077336f/9b1b17b790ee728785257f3a006b3410?OpenDocument

Bill Comments

feedback