DE HB50 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

There are no substantive changes to the law created by this Bill. This Bill constitutes a clarification of the effect of the consumer law changes in House Substitute 1 for House Bill No. 247, enacted last year. Several sections in Chapter 25 of Title 6 contained references to 2517 of Title 29, which was substantially modified by House Substitute 1 (moving the powers contained therein to several other sections). The Code Revisors designated 2517 of Title 29 as “repealed” because of the changes to the section. This Bill eliminates the reference to 2517 of Title 29 as having been repealed and provides a more general reference to the location of the relocated powers as “Chapter 25 of Title 29.”

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-21 Vetoed by Governor
2011-06-29 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-05-11 Reported Out of Committee (BANKING) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2011-03-29 Assigned to Banking Committee in Senate
2011-03-24 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-03-23 Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2011-03-15 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback