DE HB472 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act raises the public bidding thresholds for procurement of goods, contractual services, professional services, and public works contracts by the government of New Castle County to match the bidding thresholds established by the States Contracting and Purchasing Advisory Council.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To New Castle County Bidding Thresholds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-28 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |