DE HB452 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the first leg of an amendment to the Delaware Constitution to make necessary technical corrections identified by the General Assembly's Division of Research. Specifically, these technical corrections consist of the following:
Title
An Act Proposing Amendments To The Delaware Constitution Relating To Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |