DE HB439 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of The Town of Laurel to allow The Town of Laurel to finance the eligible costs of qualifying projects and items for a TIF District and a special development district created by The Town of Laurel under Section 36A of the Charter, whether any such project or item will ultimately be owned by The Town of Laurel or by the State of Delaware or any agency or instrumentality thereof, or any County, local political subdivision, instrumentality, agency, body politic, utility district or similar entity within the State of Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 288, Volume 64, Laws Of Delaware, As Amended, The Charter Of The Town Of Laurel, To Allow The Town Of Laurel To Finance The Eligible Costs Of Qualifying Projects And Items For A Tax Increment Financing (tif) District And A Special Development District Created By The Town Of Laurel Under Section 36a Of The Charter, Whether Any Such Project Or Item Will Ultimately Be Owned By The Town Of Laurel Or By The State Of Delaware Or Any Agency Or Instrumentality Thereof, Or Any County, Local Political Subdivision, Instrumentality, Agency, Body Politic, Utility District, Or Similar Entity Within The State Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |