DE HB434 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation is based on information technology (IT) recommendations of the Government Efficiency and Accountability Review (GEAR) Board established by Governor Carneys Executive Order Four. This act removes the sunset clause in 9016F (formerly 9016C) Chapter 90C of Title 29 of the Delaware Code and allows for the establishment of a shared IT services model for state agencies. The shared services model centralizes the following duties and related executive branch personnel under DTI: technology end user support, cyber security, network management, server management, data management, IT project management, software application development/support, IT procurement oversight, IT fiscal planning, IT standards, and technology governance.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 185, Volume 82 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Reallocation Of Technology Personnel And Equipment From Executive Branch Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Technology & Telecommunications) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Technology & Telecommunications Committee in House |