DE HB427 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
House Bill 373, passed by the 151st General Assembly, clarified that persons 14 and 15 years of age can be employed in such places where alcoholic beverages are served, but cannot be involved in the sale or service of alcoholic beverages. Currently, the Department of Labor (DOL) has a robust process for youth (those not yet 18) to apply for a work permit. Youth may not work in the state unless they have a DOL-issued work permit which is required to be kept on file with the employer. The OABCC statute requires an additional work permit. Youth must obtain two, separate work permits after going through two separate processes to obtain one job. This legislation will streamline that process for our youth, requiring them to obtain just one work permit from the Department of Labor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2022-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-05-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2022-05-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |