DE HB413 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Before the filing of a lawsuit, automobile insurance companies are currently not required to disclose liability coverage information to an injured claimant or the attorney representing that claimant. However, once a lawsuit is filed, this information must be disclosed. This legislation will reduce the number of lawsuits filed by requiring automobile insurance companies to disclose liability coverage information prior to the time that a lawsuit is filed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Disclosure Of Information Related To Automobile Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] |
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 413 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 413 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |