DE HB409 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act creates a state mass layoff and plant closing notice requirement law that requires certain larger employers to provide their employees with adequate notice when they plan to go out of business, close a plant, or lay off a large number of employees. This Act requires employers to also notify the Department of planned mass layoffs and plant closings, so the Department can provide dislocated workers with services to assist them in returning to work as soon as possible. This Act imposes greater notice requirements on employers than the federal Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act (WARN Act). This Act authorizes the Department of Labor to investigate violations, conduct administrative hearings for employers who are alleged to have violated this Act, and pursue penalties for failure of an employer to comply with the notice requirements to its employees.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Worker Adjustment And Retraining Notification Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-14 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 409 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 409 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 409 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |