DE HB402 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill extends the period that a label can be used following a seed test from 10 months to 15 months. The change is to make the law consistent with the current trends in the Seed Industry.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-10 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-08 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |