DE HB398 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the City of Seaford Charter to remove the section regarding Fire Department Appropriations, specifically, the City Council's authority to set aside or appropriate up to ten percent of real estate taxes to provide for and maintain the equipment of the Seaford Volunteer Fire Department. It also removes the obligation of the President of the Fire Department to submit an annual report to the City Council.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Seaford Relating To Fire Department Appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |