DE HB390 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - HS 1 for HB 390 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - HS 1 for HB 390 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Small businesses are the backbone of the economy in Delaware. In fact, 80% of the companies in Delaware employ less than 20 employees, according to recent statistics from the U.S. Census Bureau. The goal of regulatory flexibility is to foster a climate for entrepreneurial success so that small businesses will continue to create jobs, produce innovative new products and services, bring more Americans into the economic mainstream, and broaden the tax base. In 2002, the Office of Advocacy presented state model legislation, patterned after the federal Regulatory Flexibility Act, to improve the state regulatory climate for small business. This legislation adopts much of the model legislation with the intent of aiding and fostering small job growth in our State by creating a friendlier regulatory environment for small businesses.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Regulatory Flexibility Act And The Administrative Procedures Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | HS 1 for HB 390 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-17 | HS 1 for HB 390 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | HS 1 for HB 390 - Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2010-06-03 | HS 1 for HB 390 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce | |
2010-06-03 | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 390 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |