DE HB389 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is in response to concerns that an automobile insurance carrier might increase the rates or terminate the policy of non-profit transportation drivers who do not receive monetary compensation. This bill is designed to protect these drivers from these adverse effects on their insurance. The bill does not prevent insurers from using other accepted criteria, such as moving violations, to make adverse decisions regarding the insurance status of these drivers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |
2016-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |